NH HB1573 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Summary
Relative to the greenhouse gas emissions reduction fund and the renewable energy fund.
Title
Relative to the greenhouse gas emissions reduction fund and the renewable energy fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-20 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Science, Technology and Energy for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-02-10 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.782 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-01 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 13-0); House Calendar 13, PG.533 | |
2010-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/28/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2010-01-06 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2010-01-06 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2009-12-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 6, PG.245 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2468&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |