NH HB1532 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reconsider HB 1532 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Prohibiting gender reassignment surgery for minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Prohibiting gender reassignment surgery for minors.


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 162 N: 164 NV: 28 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - Table (Y: 163 N: 170 NV: 22 Abs: 37) [FAIL]


2018-03-07HouseReconsider HB 1532 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2018
2018-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 172-157 03/07/2018
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 162-164 03/07/2018
2018-03-07HouseLay HB 1532 on Table (Rep. Eaton): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 163-170 03/07/2018
2018-02-23HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-23HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 56
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments