NH HB1526 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/27/2022; Chapter 265; I. Sec 3 eff as provided in sec 4 II. Rem eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/27/2022; Chapter 265; I. Sec 3 eff as provided in sec 4 II. Rem eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to income eligibility for in and out medical assistance and relative to the executive committee for the mental health counseling compact.
Title
Relative to income eligibility for in and out medical assistance and relative to the executive committee for the mental health counseling compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Kendall Snow [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Diane Langley [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/27/2022; Chapter 265; I. Sec 3 eff as provided in sec 4 II. Rem eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2108-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2108e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1833s and 2022-1956s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1833s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2022-1956s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1833s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/14/2022, Room Reps Hall, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1181h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1181h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1181 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 03/21/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-11 | House | Division III Work Session: 03/14/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |