NH HB1494 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 280; Eff. 8/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 280; Eff. 8/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of academic standards.
Title
Relative to the definition of academic standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 280; Eff. 8/20/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0575h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0575h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0575h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 12 |