NH HB1476 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Pending Motion Committee of Conference Report # 2022-2089c; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Pending Motion Committee of Conference Report # 2022-2089c; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to release of a defendant pending trial.
Title
Relative to release of a defendant pending trial.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. Heidi Hamer [D] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 134 NV: 20 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 161 N: 168 NV: 26 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 134 NV: 20 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 161 N: 168 NV: 26 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee of Conference Report # 2022-2089c; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2089c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/19/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-05-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Gannon, Soucy; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1941s 2022-1686s and Requests CofC (Reps. Abbas, Berry, Roy, Rhodes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1941s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 19 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1941s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 19 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1686s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1686s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1686s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0895h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-134 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-21 | House | Lay HB1476 on Table (Rep. Berry): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 161-168 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2022-0895h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0895h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |