NH HB1469 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 268; eff. 09/24/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 268; eff. 09/24/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the retention of individualized education program records.
Title
Relative to the retention of individualized education program records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 268; eff. 09/24/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 6 |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/25/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 21 |