NH HB1466 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the scanning of driver licenses and nondriver identification cards.
Title
Relative to the scanning of driver licenses and nondriver identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 31 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 23 |