NH HB146 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring health care providers to furnish upon request a list of ingredients contained in an injectable medication that is recommended or administered.
Title
Requiring health care providers to furnish upon request a list of ingredients contained in an injectable medication that is recommended or administered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0507h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 32 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0507h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 32 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0507h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 15 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 36 |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Carry Over) 2021-09-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar