NH HB146 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB146

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring health care providers to furnish upon request a list of ingredients contained in an injectable medication that is recommended or administered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health care providers to furnish upon request a list of ingredients contained in an injectable medication that is recommended or administered.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-27SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
2021-05-20SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-13SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2021-04-21SenateRemote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0507h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 32
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0507h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 32
2021-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0507h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 15
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 36

Same As/Similar To

HB146 (Carry Over) 2021-09-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback