NH HB1453 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation to a chartered public school.
Title
Relative to transportation to a chartered public school.
Sponsors
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Bob Healey [R] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |