NH HB1437 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-07 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-07 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to provide a legislative report on Katie Beckett, the Medicaid program for home care for children with severe disabilities.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to provide a legislative report on Katie Beckett, the Medicaid program for home care for children with severe disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-08-20 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/19/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-07-14 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/3/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-02-17 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.959-960 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-02 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 19-0); House Calendar 13, PG.528 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-14 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/20/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.240 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2499&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |