NH HB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - No Pending Motion; 05/06/2021 Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - No Pending Motion; 05/06/2021 Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a county to exempt its chief administrative officer from compulsory participation in the retirement system.
Title
Allowing a county to exempt its chief administrative officer from compulsory participation in the retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Cassandra Levesque [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 05/06/2021 Senate Journal 14 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0877h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 21 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0877h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 21 |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0877h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 12 |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-0877h: 03/24/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97152965622 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97343187968 |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-0594h: 03/15/2021 01:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/94033090497 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 36 |