NH HB1403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to temporary waivers for vehicle emission control equipment.
Title
Relative to temporary waivers for vehicle emission control equipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Coulon [R] | Rep. Emily Phillips [R] | Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] | Rep. Michael Granger [R] |
Rep. Jacob Brouillard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0612h: Motion Adopted DV 200-166 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 97 |
2024-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2024-0612h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 96 |
2024-03-08 | House | Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0612h (NT) 02/13/2024 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 32 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 |