NH HB1403 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to members of the state board of education.
Title
Relative to members of the state board of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] |
Rep. Lisa Freeman [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 9 |