NH HB1403 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 144; Eff. 7/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 144; Eff. 7/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reinsurance.
Title
Relative to reinsurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 144; Eff. 7/26/2016 |
2016-05-18 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 6 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 81 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 13 |