NH HB1370 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 35; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 35; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a school's emergency management plan.
Title
Relative to a school's emergency management plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 35; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1220e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 54 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1220e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 03/22/2018); Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-21 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 0963s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0963s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0963s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0963s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0099h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0099h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 4 |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0099h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 8 |