NH HB1362 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1390
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1390
Summary
Extending the right-to-know oversight commission.
Title
Extending the right-to-know oversight commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1390 | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for March 17 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 21, PG.1191-1192 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 6, PG.237 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2394&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |