NH HB1347 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 244; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to information to be included in the minutes under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to information to be included in the minutes under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 244; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1720s (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1720s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1720s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1720s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-03SenateHearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-21HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0442h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 11
2018-03-21HouseAmendment # 2018-0442h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 11
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0442h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 70
2018-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback