NH HB134 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the public employees labor relations act to employees of the general court and relative to the duties of the joint committee on legislative facilities.
Title
Extending the public employees labor relations act to employees of the general court and relative to the duties of the joint committee on legislative facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 21 |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB134-FN 03/08/2023 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration |