NH HB1316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 08/25/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93567556254 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 08/25/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93567556254 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to OHRV trails known as "Ride the Wilds."
Title
Relative to OHRV trails known as "Ride the Wilds."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 08/25/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/93567556254 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 57 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 26 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2020-0243h: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 17 |