NH HB1291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2010
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2010
Summary
Relative to the fuel oil importation fee.
Title
Relative to the fuel oil importation fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-06-15 | House I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2012 | |
2010-06-15 | House Signed by the Governor 06/09/2010; Chapter 0130 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1671 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1671 Adopted; House Journal 38, PG.1915 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.325 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.323 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Hearing: March 30, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 10, Pg.171 | |
2010-03-17 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0656h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1385-1386 | |
2010-03-17 | House Amendment #0656h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1385-1386 | |
2010-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 21, PG.1196-1197 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #0656h; House Calendar 21, PG.1206 | |
2010-02-16 | House Majority Comm Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0656h for Mar 17 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 21, PG.1196-1197 | |
2010-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 6, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2049&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |