NH HB1270 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 137; eff. 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 137; eff. 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the legislative oversight committee to monitor the transformation of delivery of electric services.
Title
Repealing the legislative oversight committee to monitor the transformation of delivery of electric services.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Tina Harley [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 137; eff. 08/06/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-20 | House | Lay HB1270 on Table (Rep. Somssich): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0880h: Motion Adopted DV 173-138 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0880h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0880h (NT) (Vote 15-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2022 12:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |