NH HB1222 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adding a member to the aviation users advisory board.
Title
Adding a member to the aviation users advisory board.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Russell Ober [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
Rep. Martin Jack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0146h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0146h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0146h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 14 |