NH HB1210 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemptions from vaccine mandates.
Title
Relative to exemptions from vaccine mandates.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - OTPA (Y: 181 N: 155 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - OTPA (Y: 181 N: 155 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2022, Room 201-203, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0724h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-155 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0724h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0724h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 11:15 a.m. State HouseReps Hall |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |