NH HB1191 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electrical work, plumbing, and fuel gas fitting in one or two family housing.
Title
Relative to electrical work, plumbing, and fuel gas fitting in one or two family housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-05-06 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2022 1:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |