NH HB1180 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-142 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-142 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of Internet service.
Title
Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of Internet service.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] | Rep. Mario Ratzki [D] |
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 188 N: 142 NV: 29 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-142 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 15 |
2016-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 65 |
2016-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 65 |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 5 |