NH HB1164 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 63; Eff. 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 63; Eff. 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the agriculture in the classroom committee.
Title
Revising the agriculture in the classroom committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 63; Eff. 07/19/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0939h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0939h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0939h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/08/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |