NH HB1138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to expand the rights of minors to legal representation.
Title
Establishing a commission to expand the rights of minors to legal representation.
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine French [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] |
Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] | Rep. Edward Gordon [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 3 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 (exec. session may follow public hearing schedule) |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 11 |