NH HB1128 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0266; Effective Date 7/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0266; Effective Date 7/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study issues related to students receiving special education services while attending a chartered public school.
Title
Establishing a committee to study issues related to students receiving special education services while attending a chartered public school.
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. June Frazer [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0266; Effective Date 7/28/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1987c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1987c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1987c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014; 12:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Stiles, and Kelly; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Shaw, Myler, Frazer, Grenier |
2014-05-14 | House | Non-Concur and Request C of C (Rep Gile); Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1608s, 1786s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2014-1786s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1608s Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved to Remove HB 1128 from the Consent Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1608s, 5/8/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0604h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0604h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0604h (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 8:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-13 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-13 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/18/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/11/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |