NH HB1125 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 187; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 187; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school emergency plans.
Title
Relative to school emergency plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 187; 06/17/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1511s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1511s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1511s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0141h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0141h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0141h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |