NH HB1122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0086; Effective 6/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0086; Effective 6/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the filing with a registry of deeds of a fraudulent document purporting to create a lien or claim against real property.
Title
Relative to the filing with a registry of deeds of a fraudulent document purporting to create a lien or claim against real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0086; Effective 6/11/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1401s (Reps. Richardson/Pantelakos) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1401s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1401s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1401s, 4/24/14; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1052h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment #2014-1052h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1052h |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment for Mar 25 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 3/6/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0438h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0438h(NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Vaillancourt) |
2014-02-10 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0438h (New Title) |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0438h (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-02-05 | House | Rescheduled Executive Session: 2/6/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104=cancelled due to weather= |
2014-01-29 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-01-09 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Legislative Administration |