NH HB1107 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the Gunstock area commission for reconstruction of the main parking area.
Title
Making an appropriation to the Gunstock area commission for reconstruction of the main parking area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 14 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 9 |