NH HB1106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 293; I.Sec 2 eff. 11/01/2022 II. Sec 3-5 eff. 08/30/2022 III. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 293; I.Sec 2 eff. 11/01/2022 II. Sec 3-5 eff. 08/30/2022 III. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study recruiting members of the armed forces and the commission on demographic trends.
Title
Establishing a commission to study recruiting members of the armed forces and the commission on demographic trends.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 293; I.Sec 2 eff. 11/01/2022 II. Sec 3-5 eff. 08/30/2022 III. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2045c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2045c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2045c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-05-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Leavitt Replaces Rep. Foster 05/17/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Lascelles Replaces Rep. Harley 05/13/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators French, Hennessey, Cavanaugh; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. French Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1865s 2022-1652s and Requests CofC (Reps. Baldasaro, Massimilla, Harley, Foster): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1652s and 2022-1865s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2022-1865s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1652s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1652s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0105h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0105h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/14/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0105h (NT) (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |