NH HB1089 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-22 - Executive Session: 09/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-22 - Executive Session: 09/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statute of limitations on civil actions involving PFAS.
Title
Relative to the statute of limitations on civil actions involving PFAS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Executive Session: 09/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-05-17 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 75 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/21/2024 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 24 |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary |