NH HB1079 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to part-time employment of a retirement system retiree.
Title
Relative to part-time employment of a retirement system retiree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 11:50 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |