NH HB1048 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 105; 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 105; 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to minimum nonforfeiture amounts under the standard nonforfeiture law for individual deferred annuities.
Title
Relative to minimum nonforfeiture amounts under the standard nonforfeiture law for individual deferred annuities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 105; 07/26/2022 |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |