NH HB1043 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 101; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 101; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the capital appropriations for the legislative parking garage design and police standards and training council facility improvements.
Title
Relative to the capital appropriations for the legislative parking garage design and police standards and training council facility improvements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 101; eff. 07/01/2024 |
2024-06-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0375h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 14 |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2024-0375h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 15 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0375h (NT) 02/06/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 8 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways |