NH HB1035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 55; Eff. 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 55; Eff. 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemptions from school vaccine mandates.
Title
Relative to exemptions from school vaccine mandates.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 55; Eff. 07/19/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 100, State House, 11:40 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0854h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0854: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0854 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |