NH HB1030 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/03/2022; Chapter 31; 07/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/03/2022; Chapter 31; 07/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure by alternate experience for licensed nursing assistant.
Title
Relative to licensure by alternate experience for licensed nursing assistant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/03/2022; Chapter 31; 07/02/2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/21/2022); Senate Journal 10 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; cc) |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 1:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |