NH HB1015 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school district policies regarding objectionable material.
Title
Relative to school district policies regarding objectionable material.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |