NH CACR27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operating budget. Providing that the state shall not spend more on operating budget expenses than it receives in revenue plus any surplus from the previous budget period, or use the proceeds of any instrument of indebtedness to fund its operating expenditures.
Title
Relating to the operating budget. Providing that the state shall not spend more on operating budget expenses than it receives in revenue plus any surplus from the previous budget period, or use the proceeds of any instrument of indebtedness to fund its operating expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 201 N: 139 NV: 26 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Died on Table |
2016-05-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 72 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1870h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-139 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 70 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1870h: Amendment Adopted DV 185-125 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 69 |
2016-05-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study House Calendar 29 P. 21 |
2016-05-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1870h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 15-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 21 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/27/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Finance House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1059s, New Title, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1059s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Special Order CACR 27 to After Lunch, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1059s, New Title, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |