NH CACR23 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Lay CACR0023 on Table (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 190-140 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Lay CACR0023 on Table (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 190-140 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The New Hampshire constitution. Providing that all references to persons in the New Hampshire constitution be gender-neutral.
Title
The New Hampshire constitution. Providing that all references to persons in the New Hampshire constitution be gender-neutral.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Lay CACR0023 on Table (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 190-140 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Legislative Administration |