NE LR139 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to analyze the best use of the state's child welfare resources in line with its goals
Title
Interim study to analyze the best use of the state's child welfare resources in line with its goals
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017 |
2017-08-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-07-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33576 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR139.pdf |