NE LB257 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change filing requirements for telecommunications companies
Title
Change filing requirements for telecommunications companies
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011 | |
2011-03-10 | Presented to Governor on March 10, 2011 | |
2011-03-10 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-03-10 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Enrollment and Review ER35 adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Enrollment and Review ER35 filed | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on Select File with ER35 | |
2011-02-22 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-22 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM58 adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM58 filed | |
2011-02-09 | Placed on General File with AM58 | |
2011-01-24 | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2011 | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Date of introduction |