NE LB107 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit sexual assault of a patient, client, or student as prescribed
Title
Prohibit sexual assault of a patient, client, or student as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30931 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB107.pdf |