ND SB2304 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the adjutant general for statewide disaster services coordination; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the adjutant general for statewide disaster services coordination; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Sen. Tom Fischer [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-02-04 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba2304.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0711-01000.pdf |