ND SB2147 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 5-01-01, 5-01-16, and 5-03-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to direct shipment of alcoholic beverages from out of state; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Direct shipment of alcoholic beverages from out of state; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Philip Murphy [D] | Sen. George Sinner [D] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Ed Gruchalla [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Concurred |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |