ND HCR3061 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study educational delivery to Indian students, ways to address the unique challenges of that effort, and the feasibility and desirability of utilizing contractual options for state-supported educational delivery.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study educational delivery to Indian students, ways to address the unique challenges of that effort, and the feasibility and desirability of utilizing contractual options for state-supported educational delivery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-25 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-24 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-03-11 | Received from House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 013 n 001 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3061.html |