ND HCR3048 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study potential opportunities for the creation and utilization of public-private partnerships at institutions of higher education within the North Dakota University System, for the purpose of creating software engineering and development programs.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study potential opportunities for the creation and utilization of public-private partnerships at institutions of higher education within the North Dakota University System, for the purpose of creating software engineering and development programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Ben Hanson [D] | Rep. Alex Looysen [R] |
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01 |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 9 3 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |