ND HB1573 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. J. Lee, Oehlke A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of voucher use and provider choice for clients in human services and other programs and for funding of human services and other state programs.
Title
Introduced by Sen. J. Lee, Oehlke A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of voucher use and provider choice for clients in human services and other programs and for funding of human services and other state programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-17 | Received from House | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-11 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1573.html |